Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Abir Antonysamy

Bishop of Sultanpet, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1951 Born
1 May 197927.5Ordained PriestPriest of Pondicherry and Cuddalore, India
28 Dec 201362.2AppointedBishop of Sultanpet, India
16 Feb 201462.3Ordained BishopBishop of Sultanpet, India

MicroData Summary for Peter Abir Antonysamy
Bishop Peter Abir Antonysamy (born ) Bishop of Sultanpet

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSathipattu

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sultanpet.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Dec 2013
  • ob/c2+: CB, 14 Jan 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,101

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018