Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rolf Steinhäuser

Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

Titular Bishop of Thuburnica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1952 Born
24 Jun 197725.1Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
11 Dec 201563.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
11 Dec 201563.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Thuburnica
10 Jan 201663.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thuburnica

MicroData Summary for Rolf Steinhäuser
Bishop Rolf Steinhäuser (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKöln

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Köln {Cologne}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Dec 2015
  • ob: CB, 11 Dec 2015
  • c34: CB, 10 Jan 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 226, Number 18,796

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast