Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Philip Naameh

Archbishop of Tamale, Ghana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1948 Born
16 Dec 197729.2Ordained PriestPriest
3 Feb 199546.4AppointedBishop of Damongo, Ghana
28 May 199546.7Ordained BishopBishop of Damongo, Ghana
12 Feb 200960.4AppointedArchbishop of Tamale, Ghana

MicroData Summary for Philip Naameh
Archbishop Philip Naameh (born ) Archbishop of Tamale

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNandom-Ko

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Tamale.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Feb 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,558

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast