Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Miami

Archidioecesis Miamiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Thomas Gerard Wenski, Archbishop
  • Peter Baldacchino, Auxiliary Bishop
  • John Clement Favalora, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 2 March 1968
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Florida
  • Country: United States of America
  • Square Kilometers: 12,836 (4,958 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: XIV (FL, GA, NC, SC)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: MIA
  • Official Web Site: http://www.miamiarch.org/
  • Mailing Address: The Chancery, 9401 Biscayne Blvd., Miami Shores, FL 33138
  • Telephone: (305)757-6241
  • Fax: 754-1897

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Miami
25 May 1958ErectedDiocese of Saint Augustine Diocese of Miami (erected)
10 February 1962Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Miami (From Baltimore to Atlanta)
2 March 1968Territory LostDiocese of Miami
Diocese of Saint Augustine
Diocese of Orlando (erected)
2 March 1968Territory LostDiocese of Miami
Diocese of Saint Augustine
Diocese of Saint Petersburg (erected)
Archdiocese of Miami
2 March 1968ElevatedDiocese of Miami Archdiocese of Miami
16 June 1984Territory LostArchdiocese of Miami
Diocese of Orlando
Diocese of Palm Beach (erected)
16 June 1984Territory LostArchdiocese of Miami
Diocese of Orlando
Diocese of Saint Petersburg
Diocese of Venice (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Miami
1966426,0002,316,00018.4%1681473151,35224689396ap1967
Archdiocese of Miami
19702,229,030.0%2971444410216776104ap1971
1976744,0003,160,00023.5%2991954941,5061243702143ap1977
1980830,7003,406,90024.4%3071935001,66122193662133ap1981
1990621,0693,129,13819.8%3031414441,39882206407111ap1991
1999787,6723,597,27721.9%2641153792,07812256345108ap2000
2000800,6953,737,04721.4%3171154321,853125174357108ap2001
2001816,2073,791,04321.5%2731093822,136140163316108ap2002
2002830,3663,955,96921.0%2301133432,420146180315118ap2003
2003844,6853,955,96921.4%2361143502,413143177315111ap2004
2004856,7834,036,79921.2%2381233612,373142188321111ap2005
2009860,0004,299,00020.0%314833972,166119134281111ap2010

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 18 Aug 2014