Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hugo Nicolás Barbaro

Bishop of San Roque de Presidencia Roque Sáenz Peña


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1950 BornVicente López
15 Aug 198029.7Ordained PriestPriest of Opus Dei
22 Apr 200857.4AppointedBishop of San Roque de Presidencia Roque Sáenz Peña, Argentina
4 Jul 200857.6Ordained BishopBishop of San Roque de Presidencia Roque Sáenz Peña, Argentina
26 Jul 200857.6InstalledBishop of San Roque de Presidencia Roque Sáenz Peña, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Hugo Nicolás Barbaro:
Bishop Hugo Nicolás Barbaro (born ) Bishop of San Roque de Presidencia Roque Sáenz Peña

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Roque de Presidencia Roque Sáenz Peña.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Apr 2008
  • ob/i/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,776

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 9 Apr 2014