Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop William Edward Lori

Archbishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1951 Born
14 May 197726.0Ordained PriestPriest of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
28 Feb 199543.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
28 Feb 199543.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Bulla
20 Apr 199543.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bulla
23 Jan 200149.7AppointedBishop of Bridgeport, Connecticut, USA
19 Mar 200149.8InstalledBishop of Bridgeport, Connecticut, USA
20 Mar 201260.8AppointedArchbishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
16 May 201261.0InstalledArchbishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA

MicroData Summary for William Edward Lori
Archbishop William Edward Lori (born ) Archbishop of Baltimore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLouisville, KY

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Baltimore.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Number 12,507
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Mar 2012
  • i: CB, 20 Mar 2012
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 20 Jan 2017