Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Newark

Archidioecesis Novarcensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • John Joseph Myers, Archbishop
  • Bernard Anthony Hebda, Coadjutor Archbishop
  • Manuel Aurelio Cruz, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Edgar Moreira da Cunha, S.D.V., Auxiliary Bishop
  • Gaetano Aldo (Thomas) Donato, Auxiliary Bishop
  • John Walter Flesey, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Peter Leo Gerety, Archbishop Emeritus
  • David Arias Pérez, O.A.R., Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus
  • Dominic Anthony Marconi, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus
  • Charles James McDonnell, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 10 December 1937
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: New Jersey
  • Country: United States of America
  • Square Kilometers: 1,328 (511 Square Miles)
  • Description: Bergen, Essex, Hudson, and Union counties.
  • Conference Region: III (NJ, PA)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: NEW
  • Official Web Site: http://www.rcan.org/
  • Mailing Address: Chancery Office, 171 Clifton Ave., P.O. Box 9500, Newark, NJ 07104, USA
  • Telephone: (973)497-4002
  • Fax: 497-4525

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Newark
29 July 1853ErectedArchdiocese of New York
Diocese of Philadelphia
Diocese of Newark (erected)
2 August 1881Territory LostDiocese of Newark Diocese of Trenton (erected)
9 December 1937Territory LostDiocese of Newark (Morris, Sussex, and Passaic Counties.) Diocese of Paterson (erected)
Archdiocese of Newark
10 December 1937ElevatedDiocese of Newark Archdiocese of Newark

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Newark
19501,098,9512,480,89244.3%5952728671,2673763,606209ap1951
19661,572,8453,007,50052.3%8904311,3211,1906323,381253ap1967
19681,647,8713,076,80553.6%9004861,3861,1887593,000252ap1971
19761,426,0342,980,62947.8%7603911,1511,238805662,742253ap1977
19801,390,4272,758,00050.4%7913721,1631,1952005632,480248ap1981
19901,339,3812,751,00048.7%7693201,0891,2292214731,860241ap1991
19991,319,5582,651,78549.8%7572441,0011,3182301161,505236ap2000
20001,319,5582,666,56949.5%7022559571,3782553881,473235ap2001
20011,319,5582,655,98549.7%6992399381,4062513561,374235ap2002
20021,319,5582,809,26747.0%6952279221,4312483571,276235ap2003
20031,319,5582,809,26747.0%7022279291,4201983491,318234ap2004
20041,319,5582,835,59446.5%6902289181,4372013361,264234ap2005
20091,395,0002,970,00047.0%6511768271,6861722761,053224ap2010
20121,427,0003,089,00046.2%6071677741,843184267809220ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 20 Mar 2014