Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Yangon

Archidioecesis Yangonensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Charles Maung Bo, S.D.B., Cardinal, Archbishop
  • Noel Saw Naw Aye, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Francis Than Htun, Auxiliary Bishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Name Changed: 8 October 1991
  • Metropolitan See
  • Depends on: Dicastery for Evangelization
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Myanmar
  • Square Kilometers: 47,192 (18,227 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.yangonarchdiocese.org/
  • Mailing Address: Archbishop's House, 289 Theinbyu Road, Botataung P.O., 11161 Yangon, Myanmar
  • Telephone: (01)839.26.67; 824.54.67

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Southwestern Burma {Birmania Meridio-Occid.}
27 November 1866ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Burma (suppressed) Vicariate Apostolic of Eastern Burma {Birmania Orientale} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Central Burma {Centrale} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Southwestern Burma {Birmania Meridio-Occid.} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Burma {Birmania Meridionale}
19 July 1870Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Southwestern Burma {Birmania Meridio-Occid.} Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Burma {Birmania Meridionale}
13 February 1947Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Southern Burma {Birmania Meridionale} (Prome and Thayetmyo) Prefecture Apostolic of Akyab
Vicariate Apostolic of Rangoon
7 May 1953Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Southern Burma {Birmania Meridionale} Vicariate Apostolic of Rangoon
1 January 1955Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Rangoon (Bassein, Henzada, and Myaungmya) Diocese of Bassein (erected)
Archdiocese of Rangoon
1 January 1955ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Rangoon Archdiocese of Rangoon
Archdiocese of Yangon
8 October 1991Name ChangedArchdiocese of Rangoon Archdiocese of Yangon
22 March 1993Territory LostArchdiocese of Yangon (Southern part (Tenasserim Division and half of Mon)) Diocese of Mawlamyine (erected)
24 January 2009Territory LostArchdiocese of Yangon (Hpa-an, Kawkareik, Kyar-inn-seik-gyi, Hpa-pun, Myawaddy, Hlaingbwe, Kyaikto, Kyaikmayaw, Chaungson, Paung, Beelin, and Thaton) Diocese of Hpa-an (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Burma {Birmania Meridionale}
195070,0007,000,0001.0%63631,1112325336ap1951
Vicariate Apostolic of Rangoon
Archdiocese of Rangoon
197046,2267,982,000.6%358431,0753912431ap1971
197862,4279,202,000.7%483511,2242612633ap1981
198770,28712,767,287.6%521531,3261719233ap1991
Archdiocese of Yangon
199978,00014,570,000.5%65651,20011619644ap2000
200080,00014,580,000.5%68681,1761819644ap2001
200181,56514,670,000.6%70701,1652322750ap2002
200285,00014,700,000.6%80801,0622324750ap2004
200481,56515,000,000.5%794839822123547ap2005
201076,28314,050,000.5%7113849085326539ap2011
201468,68614,763,000.5%78251036666537141ap2015
201764,21612,300,000.5%88211095896038744ap2018
202062,15112,105,600.5%100251254976940847ap2021
202265,25712,437,000.5%90271175576544951ap2023

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Vicariate Apostolic of Rangoon
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 45, Page 619
  • Archdiocese of Rangoon
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 47, Page 263, to Page 266
  • Archdiocese of Yangon
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 83, Page 1,092

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.7, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 8 Jun 2024