Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pascal Marie Roland

Bishop of Belley-Ars


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1951 BornChatou
16 Jun 197928.4Ordained PriestPriest of Versailles, France
27 Jan 200352.0AppointedBishop of Moulins, France
2 Mar 200352.1Ordained BishopBishop of Moulins, France
15 Jun 201261.4AppointedBishop of Belley-Ars, France

MicroData Summary for Pascal Marie Roland:
Bishop Pascal Marie Roland (born ) Bishop of Belley-Ars

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Belley-Ars.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Jun 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 170, Number 14,341

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 12 Dec 2014