Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lumen Monteiro, C.S.C.

Bishop of Agartala, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1952 Born
28 Oct 198028.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Holy Cross
11 Jan 199643.9AppointedBishop of Agartala, India
26 May 199644.3Ordained BishopBishop of Agartala, India

MicroData Summary for Lumen Monteiro
Bishop Lumen Monteiro C.S.C. (born ) Bishop of Agartala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCalangute

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Agartala.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 145, Number 12,722
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast