Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Cristóbal Cardinal López Romero, S.D.B.

Archbishop of Rabat, Morocco

Cardinal-Priest of San Leone I

Apostolic Administrator of Tanger


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1952 Born
1964²11.6EnteredMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
16 Aug 196816.2First VowsMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
2 Aug 197422.2Solemn VowsMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
19 May 197927.0Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
29 Dec 201765.6AppointedArchbishop of Rabat, Morocco
10 Mar 201865.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Rabat, Morocco
24 May 201967.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Tanger, Morocco
5 Oct 201967.3Elevated to Cardinal
5 Oct 201967.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Leone I
16 Feb 202067.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Leone I

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cristóbal López Romero
Cristóbal Cardinal López Romero S.D.B. (born ) Archbishop of Rabat

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVélez-Rubio, Diocese of Almería, Spain
Ordained PriestBarcelona, Archdiocese of Barcelona, Spain
Ordained BishopSaint Pierre, Cathedral, Rabat, Archdiocese of Rabat

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Rabat.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Dec 2017
  • ob/c2: CB, 4 Jan 2018
  • c34: CB, 27 Feb 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 235, Number 19,687
  • aadm: CB, 24 May 2019
  • card: Bollettino, 1 Sep 2019
  • cpri: Bollettino, 5 Oct 2019
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 5 Oct 2019
  • i: Bollettino, 10 Feb 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast