Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jesús Galeote Tormo, O.F.M.

Vicar Apostolic of Camiri, Bolivia

Priest of Order of Friars Minor


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1951 Born
30 Mar 197523.5Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
29 Jan 197624.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor
5 Sep 197624.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
2 Aug 201765.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Camiri, Bolivia
22 Feb 201967.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Camiri, Bolivia
22 May 201967.6Ordained BishopVicar Apostolic of Camiri, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Jesús Galeote Tormo
Bishop Jesús Galeote Tormo O.F.M. (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Camiri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Diocese of Madrid, Spain
Ordained PriestMadrid, Archdiocese of Madrid, Spain
Ordained BishopSan Francisco de Asís, Cathedral, Camiri, Vicariate Apostolic of Camiri

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Camiri.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 7 Aug 2017
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2019
  • ob: CB, 4 Mar 2019
  • c2+: CB, 16 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 22 May 2019

Quantcast