Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Devprasad John Ganawa, S.V.D.

Bishop of Udaipur, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1951 Born
8 Jun 197422.5ProfessedMember of Society of the Divine Word
7 Jun 198129.4Perpetual VowsMember of Society of the Divine Word
27 Oct 198230.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
11 May 200957.4AppointedBishop of Jhabua, India
16 Jun 200957.5Ordained BishopBishop of Jhabua, India
21 Dec 201261.0AppointedBishop of Udaipur, India
21 Dec 201261.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Jhabua, India
10 Oct 201563.8CeasedApostolic Administrator of Jhabua, India

MicroData Summary for Devprasad John Ganawa
Bishop Devprasad John Ganawa S.V.D. (born ) Bishop of Udaipur

EventPlace
Birth PlacePanchkui

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Udaipur.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 May 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,188
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Dec 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast