Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Enrique Alberto Martínez Ossola

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Santiago del Estero, Argentina

Titular Bishop of Aquipendium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1952 Born
11 Mar 197825.7Ordained PriestPriest of La Rioja, Argentina
19 Jun 201765.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago del Estero, Argentina
19 Jun 201765.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquipendium
18 Aug 201765.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquipendium

MicroData Summary for Enrique Alberto Martínez Ossola
Father Enrique Alberto Martínez Ossola (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Santiago del Estero

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCórdoba, Archdiocese of Córdoba
Ordained BishopSan Nicolás de Bari, Cathedral, La Rioja, Diocese of La Rioja

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Santiago del Estero.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Jun 2017
  • mn/c1: CB, 19 Jun 2017
  • ob: CB, 28 Jun 2017
  • c2+: CB, 12 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Jul 2017