Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Béchara Boutros Cardinal Raï, O.M.M.

Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1940 BornHimlaya
3 Sep 196727.5Ordained PriestPriest of Ar-Rouhbanyat Al-Marounyat Liltoubawyat Mariam Al-Azra (Maronite)
2 May 198646.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
2 May 198646.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Caesarea Philippi
12 Jul 198646.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caesarea Philippi
9 Jun 199050.2AppointedBishop of Jbeil {Byblos} (Maronite), Lebanon
15 Mar 201171.0SelectedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
24 Mar 201171.0ConfirmedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
25 Mar 201171.0InstalledPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
24 Nov 201272.7Elevated to Cardinal

MicroData Summary for Béchara Boutros Raï:
Béchara Boutros Cardinal Raï O.M.M. (born ) Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

Please contact the Cardinal through the Patriarchate of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • card: Bollettino, 24 Oct 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 22 Jun 2015