Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Salvatore Fisichella

President of the Pontifical Council for Promoting the New Evangelization

Titular Archbishop of Vicohabentia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1951 BornCodogno
13 Mar 197624.5Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
3 Jul 199846.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy
3 Jul 199846.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Vicohabentia
12 Sep 199847.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vicohabentia
18 Jan 200250.3AppointedRector of the Pontifical Lateran University
17 Jun 200856.8AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Academy for Life
17 Jun 200856.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Vicohabentia
30 Jun 201058.8AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Promoting the New Evangelization
28 Feb 201361.5CeasedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Promoting the New Evangelization
16 Mar 201361.5ConfirmedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Promoting the New Evangelization

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Fisichella:
Archbishop Salvatore Fisichella (born ) President of Promoting the New Evangelization

Please contact the Archbishop through the Pontifical Council for Promoting the New Evangelization.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 Jun 2008
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Jun 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,380
  • c: Bollettino, 16 Mar 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014