Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Armando António Ortíz Aguirre

Bishop of Ciudad Lázaro Cárdenas, Michoacán, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1952 Born
17 Jun 197725.3Ordained PriestPriest of León, Guanajuato, México
20 Nov 201361.7AppointedBishop of Ciudad Lázaro Cárdenas, Michoacán, México
5 Feb 201461.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Lázaro Cárdenas, Michoacán, México

MicroData Summary for Armando António Ortíz Aguirre
Bishop Armando António Ortíz Aguirre (born ) Bishop of Ciudad Lázaro Cárdenas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuanajuto

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ciudad Lázaro Cárdenas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Nov 2013
  • ob: CB, 20 Nov 2013
  • c2+: CB, 5 Feb 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,090

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast