Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hansjörg Hofer

Auxiliary Bishop of Salzburg, Austria

Titular Bishop of Abziri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1952 Born
29 Jun 197624.2Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
31 May 201765.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Salzburg, Austria
31 May 201765.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Abziri
9 Jul 201765.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abziri

MicroData Summary for Hansjörg Hofer
Bishop Hansjörg Hofer (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Salzburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStumm im Zillertal, Archdiocese of Salzburg
Ordained BishopCathedral, Salzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Salzburg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 May 2017
  • ob: CB, 1 Jun 2017
  • c2+: CB, 30 Jun 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jul 2017