Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Marie Lovey, C.R.B.

Bishop of Sion {Sitten}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1950 BornOrsières
27 Oct 197121.2ProfessedMember of Canons Regular of the Hospitaller Congregation of Great Saint Bernard
15 Jun 197726.8Ordained PriestPriest of Canons Regular of the Hospitaller Congregation of Great Saint Bernard
8 Jul 201463.9AppointedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
28 Sep 201464.1Ordained BishopBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Jean-Marie Lovey:
Bishop Jean-Marie Lovey C.R.B. (born ) Bishop of Sion {Sitten}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sion {Sitten}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Jul 2014
  • ob: CB, 11 Jul 2014
  • c2+: CB, 2 Sep 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,290

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015