Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Barnaba Yousif Benham Habash

Bishop of Our Lady of Deliverance in the United States (Syrian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1951 Born
31 Aug 197524.2Ordained PriestPriest of Mossul (Syrian), Iraq
6 Nov 199544.4IncardinatedPriest of Our Lady of Deliverance of Newark (Syrian), USA
12 Apr 201058.8AppointedBishop of Our Lady of Deliverance of Newark (Syrian), USA
11 Jun 201059.0Ordained BishopBishop of Our Lady of Deliverance of Newark (Syrian), USA
31 Jul 201059.1InstalledBishop of Our Lady of Deliverance of Newark (Syrian), USA

MicroData Summary for Barnaba Yousif Benham Habash
Bishop Barnaba Yousif Benham Habash (born ) Bishop of Our Lady of Deliverance in the United States

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQaraqosh, Iraq
Ordained BishopMost Pure Virgin Mary, Church, Qaraqosh, Iraq

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Our Lady of Deliverance in the United States (Syrian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Apr 2010
  • ob/c1+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,654

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 7 Aug 2021

Quantcast