Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude Champagne, O.M.I.

Bishop of Edmundston, New Brunswick, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1947 Born
Jun 197527.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
8 Jun 197527.8ProfessedMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
9 Aug 197528.0Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
25 Mar 200355.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Halifax, Nova Scotia, Canada
25 Mar 200355.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Sufasar
11 Jun 200355.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sufasar
13 Jul 200759.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Halifax, Nova Scotia, Canada
13 Jul 200759.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Yarmouth, Nova Scotia, Canada
18 Oct 200760.2CeasedApostolic Administrator of Halifax, Nova Scotia, Canada
18 Oct 200760.2CeasedApostolic Administrator of Yarmouth, Nova Scotia, Canada
5 Jan 200961.4AppointedBishop of Edmundston, New Brunswick, Canada
25 Mar 200961.6InstalledBishop of Edmundston, New Brunswick, Canada

MicroData Summary for Claude Champagne
Bishop Claude Champagne O.M.I. (born ) Bishop of Edmundston

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLachine

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Edmundston.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Jan 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,408

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018