Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vicariate Apostolic of Meki

Vicariatus Apostolicus Mekiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Abraham Desta, Vicar Apostolic

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Vicariate Apostolic
  • Elevated: 21 December 1991
  • Vicariate
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Ethiopia
  • Square Kilometers: 52,780 (20,386 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, P.O. Box 43, Meki, East Shoa, Ethiopia; P.O. Box 12789, Addis Ababa, Ethiopia
  • Telephone: (022)118.07.63

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Meki
6 March 1980ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Harar Prefecture Apostolic of Meki (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Meki
21 December 1991ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Meki Vicariate Apostolic of Meki
11 February 2012Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Meki Prefecture Apostolic of Robe (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Meki
199012,5243,864,690.3%61824521295010ap1991
Vicariate Apostolic of Meki
199918,8935,061,763.4%101222858236510ap2000
200019,3645,213,615.4%121123841226410ap2001
200120,1075,474,070.4%111223874172210ap2002
200220,5175,583,551.4%111324854235410ap2003
200321,7095,723,139.4%131528775265910ap2004
200422,4675,855,029.4%141529774265710ap2005
201023,4636,422,202.4%211334690346010ap2011
201223,0003,600,488.6%161430766376bul:11Feb2012
201423,0534,310,802.5%131629794294514ap2015

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_d, v3.0.9, 4 May 2015; Data: 20 May 2015