Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Löhr

Auxiliary Bishop of Limburg, Germany

Titular Bishop of Diana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Feb 1952 Born
10 Oct 197624.6Ordained PriestPriest of Limburg, Germany
15 Jun 200957.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Limburg, Germany
15 Jun 200957.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Diana
30 Aug 200957.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Diana

MicroData Summary for Thomas Löhr
Bishop Thomas Löhr (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Limburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFrankfurt

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Limburg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Jun 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,265

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast