Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emmanuel Nguyên Hong Son

Bishop of Bà Rịa, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1952 Born
31 Dec 198028.9Ordained PriestPriest of Xuân Lộc, Viet Nam
22 Nov 200553.8IncardinatedPriest of Bà Rịa, Viet Nam
27 Nov 201563.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Bà Rịa, Viet Nam
20 Jan 201664.0Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Bà Rịa, Viet Nam
6 May 201765.3SucceededBishop of Bà Rịa, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel Nguyên Hong Son
Bishop Emmanuel Nguyên Hong Son (born ) Bishop of Bà Rịa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBiên Ḥa

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bà Rịa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Nov 2015
  • ob: CB, 10 Dec 2015
  • c2+: CB, 19 Jan 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 226, Number 18,798
  • s: Bollettino, 6 May 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 May 2017