Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Crean

Bishop of Cloyne, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1951 Born
20 Jun 197624.5Ordained PriestPriest of Kerry, Ireland
24 Nov 201260.9AppointedBishop of Cloyne, Ireland
27 Jan 201361.1Ordained BishopBishop of Cloyne, Ireland

MicroData Summary for William Crean
Bishop William Crean (born ) Bishop of Cloyne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTralee

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cloyne.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Nov 2012
  • c34: CB, 20 Jan 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Number 17,651

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018