Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Richard Kopacz

Bishop of Jackson, Mississippi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1950 BornDunmore, PA
7 May 197726.6Ordained PriestPriest of Scranton, Pennsylvania, USA
12 Dec 201363.2AppointedBishop of Jackson, Mississippi, USA
6 Feb 201463.4Ordained BishopBishop of Jackson, Mississippi, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Richard Kopacz:
Bishop Joseph Richard Kopacz (born ) Bishop of Jackson

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Jackson.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Dec 2013
  • ob/c1: CB, 12 Dec 2013
  • c2+: CB, 15 Jan 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 8 Feb 2014