Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Testore

Bishop of Acqui, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1952 Born
11 Jun 197725.1Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
19 Jan 201865.7AppointedBishop of Acqui, Italy
24 Feb 201865.8Ordained BishopBishop of Acqui, Italy
11 Mar 201865.8InstalledBishop of Acqui, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Testore
Bishop Luigi Testore (born ) Bishop of Acqui

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCostigliole d’Asti, Diocese of Asti
Ordained PriestCathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopSant’Ambrogio, Basilica, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Acqui.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Jan 2018
  • ob/c2: CB, 19 Jan 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 235, Number 19,682

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast