Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop António Luciano dos Santos Costa

Bishop of Viseu, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1952 Born
29 Jun 198533.1Ordained PriestPriest of Guarda, Portugal
3 May 201866.0AppointedBishop of Viseu, Portugal
17 Jun 201866.1Ordained BishopBishop of Viseu, Portugal
22 Jul 201866.2InstalledBishop of Viseu, Portugal

MicroData Summary for António Luciano dos Santos Costa
Bishop António Luciano dos Santos Costa (born ) Bishop of Viseu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCorgas
Ordained BishopCathedral, Guarda, Diocese of Guarda

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Viseu.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 May 2018
  • ob/i: CB, 3 May 2018
  • c2+: CB, 9 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 18 Jun 2018

Quantcast