Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Lenihan, O.F.M.

Bishop of La Ceiba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1951 BornAbbeyfeale, Ireland
197220.3ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
17 Sep 197726.0Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
12 Jul 198028.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
30 Dec 201160.3AppointedBishop of La Ceiba, Honduras
11 Feb 201260.4Ordained BishopBishop of La Ceiba, Honduras

MicroData Summary for Michael Lenihan:
Bishop Michael Lenihan O.F.M. (born ) Bishop of La Ceiba

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of La Ceiba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Dec 2011
  • ob: CB, 30 Dec 2011
  • c2+: CB, 9 Jan 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,257

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013