Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Thomas Konnath

Bishop of Battery (Bathery) (Syro-Malankarese)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1952 BornVadasserika
22 Dec 197826.6Ordained PriestPriest
5 Jan 200552.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trivandrum (Syro-Malankarese), India
5 Jan 200552.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Sicilibba
19 Feb 200552.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sicilibba
25 Jan 201057.7AppointedBishop of Battery (Bathery) (Syro-Malankarese), India
13 Apr 201057.9InstalledBishop of Battery (Bathery) (Syro-Malankarese), India

MicroData Summary for Joseph Thomas Konnath:
Bishop Joseph Thomas Konnath (born ) Bishop of Battery (Bathery)

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Battery (Bathery) (Syro-Malankarese).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,825
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Jan 2010

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013