Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Los Angeles

Archidioecesis Angelorum in California



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • José Horacio Gómez Velasco, Archbishop
  • Edward William Clark, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Thomas John Curry, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Alexander Salazar, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Oscar Azarcon Solis, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Gerald Eugene Wilkerson, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Roger Michael Mahony, Cardinal, Archbishop Emeritus
  • Joseph Martin Sartoris, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus
  • Gabino Zavala, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 11 July 1936
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: California
  • Country: United States of America
  • Square Kilometers: 22,685 (8,762 Square Miles)
  • Description: Comprises the Counties of Los Angeles, Santa Barbara and Ventura in the State of California.
  • Conference Region: XI (CA, HI, NV)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: LA
  • Official Web Site: http://www.la-archdiocese.org/
  • Mailing Address: 3424 Wilshire Blvd., Los Angeles, CA 90010-2241
  • Telephone: (213)637-7288
  • Fax: 637-6510

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Los Angeles-San Diego
1 June 1922SplitDiocese of Monterey-Los Angeles Diocese of Los Angeles-San Diego
Diocese of Monterey-Fresno
11 July 1936Territory LostDiocese of Los Angeles-San Diego Diocese of San Diego (erected)
Archdiocese of Los Angeles
11 July 1936ElevatedDiocese of Los Angeles-San Diego Archdiocese of Los Angeles
24 March 1976Territory LostArchdiocese of Los Angeles Diocese of Orange in California (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Los Angeles
1950832,3754,541,40018.3%4993007991,0414002,175234ap1951
19661,621,1018,716,67218.6%6897041,3931,1631,0534,495310ap1967
19709,247,261.0%7497341,48301,0433,517318ap1971
19762,208,9899,424,90623.4%8447351,5791,398261,0361,910319ap1977
19802,069,6827,908,30026.2%6416621,3031,588911,0052,545278ap1981
19903,405,1809,656,20535.3%6646581,3222,5751158942,322282ap1991
19994,080,79310,652,60038.3%6045941,1983,4061611771,926287ap2000
20004,121,60110,449,12939.4%6426281,2703,2451798551,898285ap2001
20014,148,72011,055,00037.5%7316261,3573,0571888861,857310ap2002
20024,197,63510,985,20038.2%6456061,2513,3552038241,797287ap2003
20034,206,87511,012,76338.2%6165841,2003,5052197741,751287ap2004
20044,174,30411,096,20037.6%5876111,1983,4842328051,767287ap2005
20094,603,00011,606,88939.7%5905541,1444,0233066651,924287ap2010

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 3 Apr 2013