Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Cuzco

Archidioecesis Cuschensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 23 May 1943
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Peru
  • Square Kilometers: 23,807 (9,195 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.arzobispadodelcusco.org/
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, Apartado 148, Hatun Rumiyoc s/n, Cusco, Peru
  • Telephone: (84)22.52.11
  • Fax: 22.27.81

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Cuzco
5 September 1536ErectedDiocese of Cuzco (erected)
14 May 1541Territory LostDiocese of Cuzco Diocese of Lima (erected)
1 July 1547Territory LostDiocese of Cuzco Diocese of Paraguay (erected)
27 June 1552Territory LostDiocese of Cuzco Diocese of La Plata o Charcas (erected)
20 July 1609Territory LostDiocese of Cuzco Diocese of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga) (erected)
7 October 1861Territory LostDiocese of Cuzco Diocese of Puno (erected)
5 January 1900Territory LostDiocese of Cuzco Prefecture Apostolic of San Domingo de Urubamba (erected)
Archdiocese of Cuzco
23 May 1943ElevatedDiocese of Cuzco Archdiocese of Cuzco
28 April 1958Territory LostArchdiocese of Cuzco Diocese of Abancay (erected)
10 January 1959Territory LostArchdiocese of Cuzco Territorial Prelature of Sicuani (erected)
29 April 1967Territory LostArchdiocese of Cuzco Diocese of Callao (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Cuzco
1950860,000880,00097.7%68611296,666158240145ap1951
1966610,630678,47890.0%4058986,230588553ap1967
1968446,559496,17790.0%3740775,799589034ap1971
1976516,710900,00057.4%3815539,7491459968ap1977
1980530,000606,00087.5%5715727,361349868ap1981
1990890,000915,00097.3%52581108,090510526194ap1991
19991,239,0001,256,00098.6%91661577,89111236294ap2000
20001,249,0001,269,00098.4%90521428,79511436694ap2001
20011,262,0001,280,00098.6%91531448,76311537895ap2002
20021,284,0001,300,00098.8%112751876,866171471111ap2003
20031,325,0001,350,00098.1%98761747,6143129300110ap2004
20041,350,0001,400,00096.4%726013210,2279020589ap2005
20061,420,0001,471,00096.5%815713810,28915912776ap2007
20131,538,0001,594,00096.5%795913811,14416415479ap2014

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_d, v3.0.1, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 28 Oct 2014