Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Calabar

Archidioecesis Calabarensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Joseph Effiong Ekuwem, Archbishop
  • Joseph Edra Ukpo, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 26 March 1994
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Nigeria
  • Square Kilometers: 7,754 (2,994 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Secretariat, P.M.B. 1044, Bishop Moynagh Ave., Calabar, Cross River State, Nigeria
  • Telephone: (087)231.666

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Calabar
9 July 1934ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Western Nigeria {Nigeria Occidentale} Prefecture Apostolic of Calabar (erected)
13 March 1938Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Calabar Prefecture Apostolic of Ogoja (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Calabar
12 June 1947ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Calabar Vicariate Apostolic of Calabar
Diocese of Calabar
18 April 1950ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Calabar Diocese of Calabar
1 March 1963Territory LostDiocese of Calabar Diocese of Ikot Ekpene (erected)
4 July 1989Territory LostDiocese of Calabar Diocese of Uyo (erected)
Archdiocese of Calabar
26 March 1994ElevatedDiocese of Calabar Archdiocese of Calabar

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Calabar
195067,707899,5037.5%137381,78134ap1951
1958100,7981,541,0006.5%3333,599520ap1960
1970170,6321,920,4018.9%121214,21911931ap1971
1980394,8002,809,00014.1%2716439,181254353ap1981
1990150,0002,500,0006.0%133169,37534217ap1991
Archdiocese of Calabar
1999178,5283,005,8505.9%323355,10033031ap2000
2000184,5853,505,4205.3%343374,98833932ap2001
2001187,1973,509,0325.3%364404,67944232ap2002
2002189,5372,301,7628.2%344384,98744035ap2003
2003191,0372,304,3498.3%374414,65944036ap2004
2004191,0042,303,2678.3%379464,15295236ap2005
2006322,0851,084,05629.7%415467,00175744ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.6, 8 Jan 2013; data: 2 Feb 2013