Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maximino Martínez Miranda

Auxiliary Bishop of Toluca, México, México

Titular Bishop of Lugura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 May 1951 Born
21 Sep 197928.3Ordained PriestPriest of Toluca, México, México
3 Nov 198433.4IncardinatedPriest of Atlacomulco, México, México
7 Jul 200655.1AppointedBishop of Ciudad Altamirano, Guerrero, México
31 Aug 200655.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Altamirano, Guerrero, México
28 Oct 201766.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toluca, México, México
28 Oct 201766.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Lugura

MicroData Summary for Maximino Martínez Miranda
Bishop Maximino Martínez Miranda (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Toluca

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalos Altos
Ordained BishopGrand Seminary, Ciudad Altamirano, Diocese of Ciudad Altamirano, Guerrero

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Toluca.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Jul 2006
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,230
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Oct 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast