Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hugh (Edward) Gilbert, O.S.B.

Bishop of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1952 Born
24 Dec 197018.7Converted
10 Mar 197623.9ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
10 Mar 197926.9Solemn VowsMember of Order of Saint Benedict
29 Jun 198230.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
4 Jun 201159.2AppointedBishop of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain
15 Aug 201159.4Ordained BishopBishop of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Hugh (Edward) Gilbert (VIAF: 78306631)
Bishop Hugh (Edward) Gilbert O.S.B. (born ) Bishop of Aberdeen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEmsworth, Hampshire, Diocese of Portsmouth, England
Ordained PriestOur Lady and St. John the Baptist, Abbey, Pluscarden, Elgin, Moray, Diocese of Aberdeen, Scotland
Ordained BishopOur Lady of the Assumption, Cathedral, Aberdeen, Diocese of Aberdeen, Scotland

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Aberdeen.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Jun 2011
  • ob/c1+: CB, 4 Jun 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,128
  • prof/sole: CB, 12 Feb 2016
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 235, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast