Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fulgence Rabemahafaly

Archbishop of Fianarantsoa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1951 BornMiarinavaratra
14 Aug 198029.2Ordained PriestPriest of Fianarantsoa, Madagascar
3 Jun 199948.0AppointedBishop of Ambositra, Madagascar
31 Oct 199948.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ambositra, Madagascar
1 Oct 200251.4AppointedArchbishop of Fianarantsoa, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Fulgence Rabemahafaly:
Archbishop Fulgence Rabemahafaly (born ) Archbishop of Fianarantsoa

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Fianarantsoa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Number 13,644

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 27 Nov 2013