Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Joseph McKenna

Bishop of Bathurst, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1951 Born
19 Aug 198331.6Ordained PriestPriest of Sale, Australia
15 Apr 200957.3AppointedBishop of Bathurst, Australia
26 Jun 200957.5Ordained BishopBishop of Bathurst, Australia

MicroData Summary for Michael Joseph McKenna
Bishop Michael Joseph McKenna (born ) Bishop of Bathurst

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBairnsdale

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bathurst.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Apr 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,195

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast