Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacinto Inácio Flach

Bishop of Criciúma, Santa Catarina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1952 BornBom Principio
7 May 198836.2Ordained PriestPriest of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
12 Nov 200351.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
12 Nov 200351.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Gummi in Proconsulari
5 Feb 200451.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gummi in Proconsulari
16 Sep 200957.6AppointedBishop of Criciúma, Santa Catarina, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Jacinto Inácio Flach:
Bishop Jacinto Inácio Flach (born ) Bishop of Criciúma

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Criciúma.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Sep 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,523

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013