Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine Audo, S.J.

Bishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Chaldean)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1946 BornAlep
5 Aug 197933.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
18 Jan 199246.0AppointedBishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Chaldean), Syria
11 Oct 199246.7Ordained BishopBishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Chaldean), Syria

MicroData Summary for Antoine Audo:
Bishop Antoine Audo S.J. (born ) Bishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab]

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Chaldean).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,929

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015