Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Cienfuegos

Dioecesis Centumfocencis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Split: 1 April 1995
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Camagüey
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Cuba
  • Square Kilometers: 5,360 (2,070 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Obispado, Calle 37 N. 5602, entre 56 y 58, 55100 Cienfuegos, Cuba
  • Telephone: (043)51.30.19
  • Fax: 55.16.79

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Cienfuegos
20 February 1903ErectedDiocese of San Cristobal de la Habana Diocese of Cienfuegos (erected)
Diocese of Pinar del Rio (erected)
Diocese of Cienfuegos-Santa Clara
30 June 1971Name ChangedDiocese of Cienfuegos Diocese of Cienfuegos-Santa Clara
Diocese of Cienfuegos
1 April 1995SplitDiocese of Cienfuegos-Santa Clara Diocese of Cienfuegos
Diocese of Santa Clara

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Cienfuegos
1950938,000938,58199.9%221161386,79736ap1951
19661,086,4801,278,21285.0%12193135,0472351ap1967
19681,339,663.0%718250221217ap1971
Diocese of Cienfuegos-Santa Clara
1976635,8951,363,77246.6%11102130,280114351ap1977
1980626,0001,367,77245.8%1892723,18513551ap1981
1990716,0001,563,00045.8%15142924,689141551ap1991
Diocese of Cienfuegos
1999294,000490,00060.0%8101816,3332112322ap2000
2000294,000490,00060.0%981717,294281922ap2001
2001294,000490,00060.0%881618,375282322ap2002
2002294,000490,00060.0%881618,3751102322ap2003
2003294,000490,00060.0%1081816,3331112222ap2004
2004290,000480,00060.4%461029,0001102322ap2005
2006293,600485,00060.5%1672312,7651122522ap2007
2013293,400484,70060.5%781519,5601112522ap2014
2016300,356496,41560.5%971618,7728112122ap2017

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_d, v3.2.6, 14 Jan 2019; Data: 17 Feb 2019

Quantcast