Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Crispiano Clavijo Méndez

Bishop of Sincelejo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1951 BornTocancipá
20 Nov 198837.4Ordained PriestPriest of Valledupar, Colombia
19 Feb 201563.6AppointedBishop of Sincelejo, Colombia
14 Mar 201563.7Ordained BishopBishop of Sincelejo, Colombia
28 Mar 201563.7InstalledBishop of Sincelejo, Colombia

MicroData Summary for José Crispiano Clavijo Méndez:
Bishop José Crispiano Clavijo Méndez (born ) Bishop of Sincelejo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sincelejo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Feb 2015
  • ob/i: CB, 19 Feb 2015
  • c2: CB, 5 Mar 2015
  • c34: CB, 12 Mar 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,386

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015