Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Liège

Dioecesis Leodiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Tongres (Tongeren)
344ErectedDiocese of Köln Diocese of Tongres (Tongeren) (erected)
Diocese of Maastricht
384Name ChangedDiocese of Tongres (Tongeren) Diocese of Maastricht
Diocese of Liège
720Name ChangedDiocese of Maastricht Diocese of Liège
12 May 1559Territory LostDiocese of Cambrai
Diocese of Liège
Archdiocese of Mechelen (erected)
12 May 1559Territory LostDiocese of Liège Diocese of Namur {Namen} (erected)
12 May 1559Territory LostDiocese of Cambrai
Diocese of Liège
Diocese of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers} (erected)
12 May 1559Territory LostArchdiocese of Köln {Cologne}
Diocese of Liège
Diocese of Roermond (erected)
12 May 1559Territory LostDiocese of Liège Diocese of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc) (erected)
29 November 1801Territory LostArchdiocese of Köln {Cologne}
Diocese of Liège
Diocese of Aachen (erected)
1840Territory LostDiocese of Liège Vicariate Apostolic of Limburg (erected)
Diocese of Liège, Eupen et Malmédy
30 July 1921Name ChangedDiocese of Liège Diocese of Liège, Eupen et Malmédy
Diocese of Liège
16 November 1925Name ChangedDiocese of Liège, Eupen et Malmédy Diocese of Liège
31 May 1967Territory LostDiocese of Liège Diocese of Hasselt (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Liège
19501,300,0001,424,29791.3%1,8107102,5205151,4005,500778ap1951
1970900,0001,016,13188.6%9803181,2986932461515ap1971
1980800,0001,007,49079.4%7872231,010792313041,819518ap1981
1990780,000993,06078.5%659189848919662561,239523ap1991
1999700,0001,017,80568.8%4802096891,01572276801505ap2000
2000700,0001,016,76268.8%4651856501,07674247762525ap2001
2001700,0001,020,07768.6%4451846291,11275247743525ap2002
2002700,0001,023,50668.4%4401846241,12174250743525ap2003
2003700,0001,023,50668.4%4211225431,28976175609525ap2004
2004700,0001,023,50668.4%4021225241,33574168579525ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_d, v3.0.3, 15 Nov 2014; Data: 17 Nov 2014