Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthieu Nguyên Văn Khôi

Bishop of Quy Nhơn (Qui Nhơn), Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1951 Born
10 May 198937.5Ordained PriestPriest of Quy Nhơn (Qui Nhơn), Viet Nam
31 Dec 200958.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Quy Nhơn (Qui Nhơn), Viet Nam
4 Feb 201058.3Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Quy Nhơn (Qui Nhơn), Viet Nam
30 Jun 201260.7SucceededBishop of Quy Nhơn (Qui Nhơn), Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Matthieu Nguyên Văn Khôi
Bishop Matthieu Nguyên Văn Khôi (born ) Bishop of Quy Nhơn (Qui Nhơn)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePhuoc Son, Tuy Phuoc, B́nh Đinh

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Quy Nhơn (Qui Nhơn).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 Dec 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • s: Bollettino, 30 Jun 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,567

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast