Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Manila

Archidioecesis Manilensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Luis Antonio Gokim Tagle, Cardinal, Archbishop
  • Bernardino Cruz Cortez, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Broderick Soncuaco Pabillo, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Gaudencio Borbon Rosales, Cardinal, Archbishop Emeritus
  • Teodoro J. Buhain, Jr., Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 14 August 1595
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Philippines
  • Square Kilometers: 549 (212 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.rcam.org/
  • Mailing Address: 121 Arzobispo St., Intramuros, P.O. Box 132, 1099 Manila, Philippines
  • Telephone: (02)527.76.31; 400.75.19; 301.10
  • Fax: 527.39.55/6

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Manila
6 February 1579ErectedDiocese of Manila (erected)
14 August 1595Territory LostDiocese of Manila Diocese of Nueva Caceres (erected)
14 August 1595Territory LostDiocese of Manila Diocese of Cebu (erected)
14 August 1595Territory LostDiocese of Manila Diocese of Nueva Segovia (erected)
Archdiocese of Manila
14 August 1595ElevatedDiocese of Manila Archdiocese of Manila
10 April 1910Territory LostArchdiocese of Manila Diocese of Lipa (erected)
11 December 1948Territory LostArchdiocese of Manila Diocese of San Fernando (erected)
25 November 1961Territory LostArchdiocese of Manila Diocese of Imus (erected)
25 November 1961Territory LostArchdiocese of Manila Diocese of Malolos (erected)
24 January 1983Territory LostArchdiocese of Manila Diocese of Antipolo (erected)
7 December 2002Territory LostArchdiocese of Manila Diocese of Novaliches (erected)
7 December 2002Territory LostArchdiocese of Manila Diocese of Parañaque (erected)
28 June 2003Territory LostArchdiocese of Manila Diocese of Cubao (erected)
28 June 2003Territory LostArchdiocese of Manila Diocese of Kalookan (erected)
28 June 2003Territory LostArchdiocese of Manila Diocese of Pasig (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Manila
19501,749,3162,120,59082.5%1573324893,5776111,230117ap1951
19703,071,8783,596,63985.4%1621,2641,4262,1541,5163,315111ap1971
19805,497,9545,867,61393.7%1631,0551,2184,51312,1443,149158ap1981
19906,502,0006,917,00094.0%3647551,1195,8102,3672,807201ap1991
19998,486,2739,349,58190.8%5479171,4645,796912,5222,556263ap2000
20008,463,1129,349,58190.5%5857791,3646,204142,3662,463267ap2001
20018,699,2539,379,47492.7%5498031,3526,434141,8562,803270ap2002
20028,699,2539,379,47492.7%5286601,1887,32271,6752,156270ap2003
20032,719,7812,993,00090.9%18618614,62230371085ap2004
20042,719,7812,993,00090.9%2192564755,72523691,73085ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_d, v3.0.1, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 21 Oct 2014