Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hugo Manuel Salaberry Goyeneche, S.J.

Bishop of Azul, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1952 Born
3 Dec 198533.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
15 Aug 198937.4Solemn VowsPriest of Society of Jesus
24 May 200654.2AppointedBishop of Azul, Argentina
21 Aug 200654.4Ordained BishopBishop of Azul, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Hugo Manuel Salaberry Goyeneche
Bishop Hugo Manuel Salaberry Goyeneche S.J. (born ) Bishop of Azul

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Andrés de Giles

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Azul.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 May 2006
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,222

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast