Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Toronto

Archidioecesis Torontinus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 18 March 1870
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Province: Ontario
  • Country: Canada
  • Square Kilometers: 13,000 (5,021 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Ontario
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: T
  • Official Web Site: http://www.archtoronto.org/
  • Mailing Address: Chancery Office, 1155 Yonge Street, Toronto, ON M4T 1W2, Canada
  • Telephone: (416)934-0606
  • Fax: 934-3433

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Toronto
17 December 1841ErectedDiocese of Kingston Diocese of Toronto (erected)
21 February 1856Territory LostDiocese of Toronto
29 February 1856Territory LostDiocese of Toronto Diocese of Hamilton (erected)
Archdiocese of Toronto
18 March 1870ElevatedDiocese of Toronto Archdiocese of Toronto
22 November 1958Territory LostDiocese of Hamilton
Archdiocese of Toronto
Diocese of Saint Catharines (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Toronto
1950196,8261,302,10415.1%2362484844065521,141120ap1951
1966595,0002,870,00020.7%2933866798768421,360148ap1967
1970645,0003,300,00019.5%2964006969265891,030168ap1971
1976900,0003,300,00027.3%2974657621,181448211,060174ap1977
19801,007,0003,550,00028.4%2994807791,292778171,010182ap1981
19901,082,9443,800,00028.5%3425859271,168102756996211ap1991
19991,798,0005,215,00034.5%3825068882,024114693705222ap2000
20001,832,0005,315,00034.5%3874948812,079142619733222ap2001
20011,847,0005,360,00034.5%3855018862,084147613738222ap2002
20021,420,3954,147,68034.2%3774858621,647129606734222ap2003
20031,693,6905,043,08533.6%3594458042,106105551667223ap2004
20041,363,6575,043,08527.0%3634488111,68196510668223ap2005
20101,931,0005,679,00034.0%3764498252,340112572571217ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 8 Apr 2014