Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rodrigo Aguilar Martínez

Bishop of San Cristóbal de Las Casas, Chiapas, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1952 Born
25 Jul 197523.3Ordained PriestPriest of Morelia, Michoacán, México
28 May 199745.2AppointedBishop of Matehuala, San Luís Potosí, México
31 Jul 199745.4Ordained BishopBishop of Matehuala, San Luís Potosí, México
28 Jan 200653.8AppointedBishop of Tehuacán, Puebla, México
3 Nov 201765.6AppointedBishop of San Cristóbal de Las Casas, Chiapas, México
1 Jan 201865.8InstalledBishop of San Cristóbal de Las Casas, Chiapas, México

MicroData Summary for Rodrigo Aguilar Martínez
Bishop Rodrigo Aguilar Martínez (born ) Bishop of San Cristóbal de Las Casas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValle de Santiago
Ordained BishopEstadio Manuel Moreno, Matehuala, Diocese of Matehuala, San Luís Potosí

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Cristóbal de Las Casas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Jan 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 13,035
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Nov 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018