Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edmund Woga, C.SS.R.

Bishop of Weetebula, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1950 Born
29 Nov 197727.0Ordained PriestPriest of Weetebula, Indonesia
198534.1ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
4 Apr 200958.3AppointedBishop of Weetebula, Indonesia
16 Jul 200958.6Ordained BishopBishop of Weetebula, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Edmund Woga
Bishop Edmund Woga C.SS.R. (born ) Bishop of Weetebula

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHewokloang

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Weetebula.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Apr 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,251

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 May 2017