Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Leo Thomas

Bishop of Las Vegas, Nevada, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1950 Born
22 May 197626.0Ordained PriestPriest of Seattle, Washington, USA
19 Nov 199949.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Seattle, Washington, USA
19 Nov 199949.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Vagrauta
28 Jan 200049.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vagrauta
23 Mar 200453.8AppointedBishop of Helena, Montana, USA
4 Jun 200454.0InstalledBishop of Helena, Montana, USA
28 Feb 201867.7AppointedBishop of Las Vegas, Nevada, USA
15 May 201867.9InstalledBishop of Las Vegas, Nevada, USA

MicroData Summary for George Leo Thomas
Bishop George Leo Thomas (born ) Bishop of Las Vegas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAnaconda
Ordained BishopSaint James, Cathedral, Seattle, Archdiocese of Seattle, Washington

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Las Vegas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Number 13,689
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Feb 2018
  • i: CB, 28 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast