Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Francis Hennessey

Auxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts

Titular Bishop of Tigias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1952 BornSouth Boston
20 May 197826.1Ordained PriestPriest of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
12 Oct 200654.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
12 Oct 200654.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tigias
12 Dec 200654.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tigias

MicroData Summary for Robert Francis Hennessey:
Bishop Robert Francis Hennessey (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Boston

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Boston.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Oct 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Number 15,295

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013